Hernandez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stephanie F Hernandez
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv04798
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Brown, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Kelly, Kathryn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing set for 9/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(ek, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/18/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/11/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16154197. (Brown, James)
July 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stephanie F Hernandez by James P. Brown (Brown, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephanie F Hernandez; (Brown, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie F Hernandez
Represented By: James P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?