Jarvis v. Bloomingdales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jarvis
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Macy's Inc. and Schindler Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04808
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendant Bloomingdales Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment #23 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response is due by 9/25/19. Defendant's reply is due by 10/9/19. Once the motion is fully briefed, the Court will rule via CM/ECF notice. Mailed notice (air, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Brandstedt for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment #23 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/28/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Brandstedt, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 RULE 56.1 Statement by Bloomingdales, Inc. regarding motion for partial summary judgment #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brandstedt, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Bloomingdales, Inc. in support of motion for partial summary judgment #23 (Brandstedt, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Bloomingdales, Inc. for partial summary judgment (Brandstedt, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Status hearing held. Parties informed of this Court's standing order on discovery, including the need for a face-to-face meet and confer before filing discovery motions, and that responsive briefs shall not be filed before a discovery motion is heard without leave of court. Status hearing set for 10/10/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This matter has been referred to Judge Cox for discovery supervision and to conduct a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. Parties to review the Court's webpage under the heading Rule 26(f) Planning Conference. Parties having filed a status report on 7/31/2019, #18 , no new submission will be required. Mailed notice (np, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Susan E. Cox for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference. (air, )Mailed notice.
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/7/2019: Status hearing held. On Plaintiff's oral motion, and without objection, Macy's, Inc., and Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., are dismissed from this case without prejudice. For the reasons set forth in open court and as explained further in the Statement below, Defendant Bloomingdale's motion to dismiss Count 1 of the complaint #13 is denied. Defendant Bloomingdale is to amend its answer by 8/21/19. Parties are to comply with their initial production requirements under the MIDP program by 9/23/19. Parties may move forward with formal discovery immediately thereafter. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cox for all further discovery scheduling and supervision; the referral will also include the authority to conduct a settlement conference as necessary. (For further details see order) Mailed notice(air, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report) by Bloomingdales, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation (Brandstedt, Steven)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stephanie Jarvis by James Joshua Parr (Parr, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stephanie Jarvis by Michael S. Agruss (Agruss, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Brandstedt for presentment of motion to dismiss #13 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Brandstedt, Steven)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Bloomingdales, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bernover, Alan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Bloomingdales, Inc. to dismiss count one of plaintiff's complaint (Bernover, Alan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Bloomingdales, Inc.(Bernover, Alan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Schindler Elevator Corporation(Bernover, Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: A status hearing is set for 8/7/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (clw, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT by Defendants Bloomingdales, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation regarding notice of removal, #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bernover, Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
July 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bloomingdales, Inc. (Bernover, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Schindler Elevator Corporation (Bernover, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2019 L 006219) filed by Bloomingdales, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16041051. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bernover, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bernover, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bloomingdales, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation by Alan Max Bernover (Bernover, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bloomingdales, Inc., Schindler Elevator Corporation by Steven Michael Brandstedt (Brandstedt, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis v. Bloomingdales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdales, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Max Bernover
Represented By: Steven Michael Brandstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Alan Max Bernover
Represented By: Steven Michael Brandstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jarvis
Represented By: James Joshua Parr
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?