Rogers v. City of Hobart, Indiana et al
Plaintiff: Cortez Javan Rogers
Defendant: Hobart (Indiana) Police Department, City of Hobart, Indiana and Hobart Police Deparment
Case Number: 1:2019cv04815
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by William Clifton Holmes for presentment of motion to amend/correct #17 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Holmes, William)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Cortez Javan Rogers to amend/correct other #16 Motion to File Corrected Copy of First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Holmes, William)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 First Amended Complaint by Cortez Javan Rogers Plaintiff's FRCP 15(a) First Amended Complaint (Holmes, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Jude Atkus for presentment of motion to dismiss #13 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Atkus, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by City of Hobart, Indiana, Hobart Police Deparment in support of motion to dismiss #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Atkus, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Hobart Police Deparment, City of Hobart, Indiana to dismiss (Atkus, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court and for the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 9/13/2019. Status hearing set for 9/18/2019 #4 remains firm. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Cortez Javan Rogers to notice of motion #9 (Holmes, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Cortez Javan Rogers to motion for extension of time to file response/reply #8 (Holmes, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Jude Atkus for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #8 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Atkus, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants City of Hobart, Indiana, Hobart Police Deparment for extension of time to file response/reply (Atkus, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Hobart, Indiana, Hobart Police Deparment by Michael Jude Atkus (Atkus, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Hobart, Indiana, Hobart Police Deparment by Matthew Scott Clark (Clark, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cortez Javan Rogers as to City of Hobart, Indiana on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Holmes, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
July 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Hobart, Indiana (yt)
July 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Holmes, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cortez Javan Rogers; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16042370.(Holmes, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. City of Hobart, Indiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart (Indiana) Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hobart, Indiana
Represented By: Michael Jude Atkus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Police Deparment
Represented By: Michael Jude Atkus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Javan Rogers
Represented By: William Clifton Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?