Kowalski v. Paloian et al
Appellee: Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP, Merrick Bank, Gus Paloian, William Kowalski, JP Morgan Chase, Premier Bankcard, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Joel Levin, AT&T Corp. c/o AT&T Services, Inc. and Illinois Bell Telephone Company, 5305-7 West Leland Avenue Condominium Association, The Huntington National Bank, Illinois Department of Revenue, Ally Bank, ACAR Leasing Ltd d/b/a GM Financial Leasing, Internal Revenue Service, Parkway Bank & Trust, Discover Bank, Martha Padilla, FDIC as receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings and Patrick Layng
Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Case Number: 1:2019cv04851
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, the appellant shall serve and file his opening brief by 9/18/2019. The appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 10/18/2019. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 11/1/2019. In addition, the Court notes that the appellant previously filed an emergency motion to stay sale of estate properties #3 when the case was assigned to another judge. That motion has not been re-noticed for presentment before the currently assigned judge. If the appellant desires the motion to be heard, he must re-notice the motion to be heard by Judge Wood, according to her motion procedures. If the appellant does not notice the motion for presentment within 14 days, the motion will be stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit, #114 Exhibit, #115 Exhibit, #116 Exhibit, #117 Exhibit, #118 Exhibit, #119 Exhibit, #120 Exhibit, #121 Exhibit, #122 Exhibit, #123 Exhibit, #124 Exhibit, #125 Exhibit, #126 Exhibit, #127 Exhibit, #128 Exhibit, #129 Exhibit, #130 Exhibit, #131 Exhibit, #132 Exhibit, #133 Exhibit, #134 Exhibit, #135 Exhibit, #136 Exhibit, #137 Exhibit, #138 Exhibit, #139 Exhibit, #140 Exhibit, #141 Exhibit, #142 Exhibit, #143 Exhibit, #144 Exhibit, #145 Exhibit, #146 Exhibit, #147 Exhibit, #148 Exhibit, #149 Exhibit, #150 Exhibit, #151 Exhibit, #152 Exhibit, #153 Exhibit, #154 Exhibit, #155 Exhibit, #156 Exhibit, #157 Exhibit, #158 Exhibit, #159 Exhibit, #160 Exhibit, #161 Exhibit, #162 Exhibit, #163 Exhibit, #164 Exhibit, #165 Exhibit, #166 Exhibit, #167 Exhibit, #168 Exhibit, #169 Exhibit, #170 Exhibit, #171 Exhibit, #172 Exhibit, #173 Exhibit, #174 Exhibit, #175 Exhibit, #176 Exhibit, #177 Exhibit, #178 Exhibit, #179 Exhibit, #180 Exhibit, #181 Exhibit, #182 Exhibit, #183 Exhibit, #184 Exhibit, #185 Exhibit, #186 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: This case has been reassigned. All prior hearings set before this court are stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order #5 , this case has been reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. The Appellant shall re-notice the emergency motion #3 before this Court. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/29/2019.(pk, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Kowalski for presentment of Appellant 's motion to stay #3 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (gcy, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 DEBTOR'S EMERGENCY MOTION to stay sale of estate properties by Robert M. Kowalski. (gcy, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Patrick Layng of Non-Participation (Gulden, Cameron)
July 23, 2019 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to counsel of record. (gcy, )
July 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 9130 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Paloian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Merrick Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gus Paloian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Premier Bankcard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joel Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AT&T Corp. c/o AT&T Services, Inc. and Illinois Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 5305-7 West Leland Avenue Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ACAR Leasing Ltd d/b/a GM Financial Leasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Parkway Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Martha Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FDIC as receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert M. Kowalski
Represented By: Jan R. Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?