Lukis v. Whitepages Incorporated
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lukis
Defendant: Whitepages Incorporated
Petitioner: Instant Checkmate, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04871
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss #16 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond by 10/2/2019; reply due by 10/23/2019. Defendant's unopposed motion to stay discovery pending resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss #19 is granted. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of the motion to dismiss.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS Report [Joint] by Whitepages Incorporated (Kimrey, Blaine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 8/28/2019 #10 is stricken and re-set for 8/27/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Hearing on motion to dismiss #16 and motion to stay #19 set for 8/27/2019 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Blaine C Kimrey for presentment of motion to stay #19 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kimrey, Blaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Whitepages Incorporated to stay (Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Whitepages' Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kimrey, Blaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Blaine C Kimrey for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kimrey, Blaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Whitepages Incorporated in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kimrey, Blaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Whitepages Incorporated to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Whitepages Incorporated (Kimrey, Blaine)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Instant Checkmate's motion to reassign case #11 is granted. Case 19 C 4892, Fischer et al v. Instant Checkmate LLC. (Norgle, J.), will be forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Judge Feinerman's calendar pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing set for 8/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #11 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Instant Checkmate, LLC Notice of Motion to Reassign (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spears, Natalie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Natalie J. Spears for presentment of motion to reassign case #11 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Spears, Natalie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Movant Instant Checkmate, LLC to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spears, Natalie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #8 is granted. The time for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 8/21/2019. Motion hearing set for 7/29/2019 #9 is stricken. Status hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Blaine C Kimrey for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kimrey, Blaine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Whitepages Incorporated for extension of time to File a Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) (Kimrey, Blaine)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Whitepages Incorporated (Kimrey, Blaine)
July 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Whitepages Incorporated by Jonathon Philip Reinisch (Reinisch, Jonathon)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Whitepages Incorporated by Blaine C Kimrey (Kimrey, Blaine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kimrey, Blaine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019-CH-07399) filed by Whitepages Incorporated Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16051704. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kimrey, Blaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lukis v. Whitepages Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lukis
Represented By: Roberto Luis Costales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitepages Incorporated
Represented By: Blaine C Kimrey
Represented By: Jonathon Philip Reinisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Instant Checkmate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?