United States of America v. Funds in the Amount of $145,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY and Roberto Sanz
Case Number: 1:2019cv04910
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Roberto Sanz(Pollack, Zachary)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Roberto Sanz regarding $145.000.00 USC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Pollack, Zachary)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Funds in the Amount of $145,000 in United States Currency, Roberto Sanz by Zachary B. Pollack (Pollack, Zachary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals Service as to Funds in the amount of $145,000 in United States Currency. (aee, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing set for 10/1/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued for funds in the amount of $145,000 in United States Currency (bg, )
July 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Erin Elaine Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kelly, Erin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT U.S. v. FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; (Kelly, Erin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the Amount of $145,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Sanz
Represented By: Zachary Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Erin Elaine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?