Torgersen v. Siemens Building Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Torgersen
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. and Siemens Building Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04975
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 11/5/19 at 9:30 a.m. No deadlines will be set as the parties determine if this matter will remain in Federal Court. Defendants' first motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #12 is granted to 9/26/19. Motion hearing date of 9/25/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Siemens Corporation, Siemens Industry, Inc. by Thomas Frank Cameli (Cameli, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (O'Connell-Miller, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (O'Connell-Miller, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller Amended Appearance (O'Connell-Miller, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report Plaintiff's Rule 26(f) Status Report by Paul Torgersen (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing NOF: P's Rule 26(f) Status Report)(Streckert, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Torgersen by Daniel Herbert Streckert (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Appearance)(Streckert, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Initial status hearing set for 9/19/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
July 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller (O'Connell-Miller, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. (Cameli, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. by Thomas Frank Cameli (Cameli, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cameli, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (19L006520) filed by Siemens Building Technology, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16065217. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Cameli, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torgersen v. Siemens Building Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Thomas Frank Cameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Corporation
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Thomas Frank Cameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc.
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Thomas Frank Cameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Building Technology, Inc.
Represented By: James Leighton O'Connell-Miller
Represented By: Thomas Frank Cameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Torgersen
Represented By: Daniel Herbert Streckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?