Guzowski v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Guzowski
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05046
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arce, Jimmy)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/17/2019.(ek, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the joint consent to exercise jurisdiction #6 , this case is transferred to the Magistrate Judge for any further proceedings. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marcus, Meredith)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Arce, Jimmy)
July 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher M. Guzowski by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher M. Guzowski by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher M. Guzowski for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Daley, Frederick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher M. Guzowski; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzowski v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Jimmy Lorenzo Arce
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Guzowski
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?