Wilcosky v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bennett Wilcosky
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05061
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Plaintiffs Bennett Wilcosky, Michael Gunderson, and Michael Gunderson, as next friend of E.G., a minor, sued defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc. in the Circuit Court of Cook County, alleging that defendants violated the Illinois Biometric Information Privacy Act ("BIPA"), 740 ILCS 14/1 et seq. in connection with defendants' "Alexa" product, which is "a voice-based virtual assistant." Defendant removed the case to this court and then filed motions to dismiss and to compel arbitration [Doc. #16 , #19 ].During the court's review of the parties' briefs on the pending motions, it became apparent that there may be a serious question as to the court's subject matter jurisdiction. Because this court has an independent obligation to ensure that it has subject matter jurisdiction over a case before reaching the merits, see United States v. $340,980 in U.S. Currency, 732 F.3d 812, 817-18 (7th Cir. 2013), the parties are directed to file by March 18, 2020, simultaneous briefs addressing whether plaintiff has alleged an injury-in-fact sufficient to establish Article III standing to proceed in federal court. See McGinnis v. United States Cold Storage, Inc., 2019 WL 7049921 (N.D. Ill. Dec. 23, 2019). Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/19/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
February 11, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties have failed to deliver courtesy copies of their response and reply briefs #29 #30 #31 and #32 in direct violation of this court's rules. The parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the court's Standing Order and deliver properly bound briefs to chambers by 2/12/2020. The status hearing set for 2/25/2020 is stricken. The court will rule via CM/ECF. Mailed notice (cn).
January 3, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 2/11/2020 is stricken and reset to 2/25/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
December 9, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. to motion to dismiss #19 Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. to motion to compel #16 Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky to motion to dismiss #19 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Bekkerman, Gerald)
November 14, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Bennett Wilcoskyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. to compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims #16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bennett Wilcosky, #2 Exhibit A-Interrogatory Answers, #3 Exhibit B-RFP Responses, #4 Exhibit C-RFP Production, #5 Exhibit D-B.F. and A.A. v Amazon, Inc.)(York, Adam)
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/10/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct arbitration-related discovery #25 is granted. Briefing schedule on defendants' motion to compel and dismiss #16 and motion to dismiss #19 is amended as follows: Plaintiff's response due 11/14/2019, defendants' combined reply due 12/9/2019. Status hearing set tentatively for a ruling on 1/23/2019 #23 is stricken and reset to 2/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Gerald Jonathan Bekkerman for presentment of motion for discovery #25 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Bekkerman, Gerald)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Arbitration-Related Discovery NOTICE of Motion by Gerald Jonathan Bekkerman for presentment of motion for discovery #25 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/8/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Bekkerman, Gerald)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky for discovery Motion for leave to Conduct Arbitration related discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Arb Disc, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Bekkerman, Gerald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Adam C York (York, Adam)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/10/2019. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss, or in the alternative, stay claims #16 and motion to dismiss #19 due by 10/31/2019, defendants' combined reply due 11/21/2019. Status hearing set for 1/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Michael James Aschenbrener (Aschenbrener, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of motion to dismiss #19 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #19 Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alexa and Alexa Device FAQs, #2 Exhibit B - Alexa Terms of Use)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. to dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of motion to compel #16 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. in support of motion to compel #16 Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brian Buckley, #2 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Decl. Exhibit H)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. to compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Sean Patrick Murray (Murray, Sean)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Brennan Byron Hutson (Hutson, Brennan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Marc Alan Taxman (Taxman, Marc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bennett Wilcosky by Gerald Jonathan Bekkerman (Bekkerman, Gerald)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc.'s motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint #9 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due 9/3/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 8/13/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. for extension of time (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, )
July 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Tyler Zachary Zmick (Zmick, Tyler)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Alex David Berger (Berger, Alex)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-CH-07777) filed by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16076907. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcosky v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Alex David Berger
Represented By: Tyler Zachary Zmick
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alex David Berger
Represented By: Tyler Zachary Zmick
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Wilcosky
Represented By: Marc Alan Taxman
Represented By: Gerald Jonathan Bekkerman
Represented By: Brennan Byron Hutson
Represented By: Adam C York
Represented By: Sean Patrick Murray
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?