Walker v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Walker
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05112
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Darren Van Puymbrouck of Change of Address (Van Puymbrouck, Darren)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC(Minichello, Dennis)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC by Dennis Minichello (Minichello, Dennis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Richard Walker regarding Summons and Complaint by Sheriff's Office of DuPage County served on Defendant on August 6, 2019 (Van Puymbrouck, Darren)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
July 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC (mc, )
July 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Walker by Darren Van Puymbrouck (Van Puymbrouck, Darren)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Walker; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16083033.(Van Puymbrouck, Darren)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Van Puymbrouck, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Walker
Represented By: Darren Van Puymbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Minichello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?