Siragusa et al v. Collazo
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Siragusa, Robert J. Siragusa, Dana Siragusa and Julie Siragusa
Defendant: Arturo Collazo
Case Number: 1:2019cv05151
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Joint motion for leave to re-file opposition memoranda to objections to proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law #5 is granted. The Court will rule electronically and inform the parties if further briefing is needed. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dana Siragusa, Robert Joseph Siragusa (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corrected Written Objections to Proposed Findings and Conclusions, #2 Supplement Response to Objections to Court's Proposed Findings and Conclusions)(Cooke, Patrick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Defendant Arturo Collazo Defendant's Response to the Plaintiff's Rule 9033 Objections to the Court's Proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Re-file) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herzog, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by Arturo Collazo to findings of fact, #1 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herzog, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Gerard Cooke for presentment of motion for leave to file #5 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Cooke, Patrick)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dana Siragusa, Robert Joseph Siragusa for leave to file (re-file) Opposition Memoranda to Objections to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Cooke, Patrick)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to findings of fact, #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
July 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (ec, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cooke, Patrick)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to findings of fact, #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 13 A 216 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siragusa et al v. Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Collazo
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Siragusa
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Siragusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Siragusa
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Siragusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?