Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.0.133 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv05169
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (pj, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #18 filed on 10/18/2019, this case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing date of 10/30/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Motion of Attorney Andrew Barrios to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff #16 is granted. Notice of motion date of 11/5/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC without prejudice (Herman, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Michael Barrios for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/5/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Barrios, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Andrew Barrios to withdraw as attorney for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. No party information provided (Barrios, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 10/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Andrew Michael Barrios (Barrios, Andrew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena #9 is granted. Motion hearing date of 8/22/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #9 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/22/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCLeave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials(mc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 9/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16090172. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.72.0.133
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Represented By: Andrew Michael Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?