Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 98.213.218.63
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 98.213.218.63
Case Number: 1:2019cv05178
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Referring Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of minute order dated 10/29/2019 to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order)(pk, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff has filed a notice of settlement, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement With John Doe (Herman, Timothy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 10/23/19 is reset to 11/21/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report Second Status Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 9/19/19 is reset to 10/23/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is granted #9 . The information requested in the subpoena shall be limited to: name, address, telephone number, email address and Media Access Control number (the Information). Once produced, the Information shall be maintained as confidential by Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel for a period of not less than 60 days. Additionally, once the Information is produced, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to provide the person(s) identified by the Information with a copy of this order via overnight delivery within two business days of its production. The person(s) so identified shall be given leave to file an objection to the public disclosure of the Information within 30 days of the receipt of this order. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #9 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCfor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 9/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/1/2019. (cc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 copyright report) (cc, )
July 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16090942. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 98.213.218.63
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber assigned IP address 98.213.218.63
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?