Ademiju v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James O. Ademiju
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv05183
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by James O. Ademiju of Change of Address. (Envelope Postmarked 8/24/2019) (jh, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff James O. Ademiju for Counsel Appointment. (Envelope Postmarked 8/24/2019) (jh, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff James O. Ademiju for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope Postmarked 8/24/2019) (jh, )
August 1, 2019 MAILED to Plaintiff an an IFP application along with a copy of order dated 7/31/2019. (pk, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: After petitioner James Ademiju pled guilty to one count of healthcare fraud in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1347, this court sentenced him to an eleven month term of imprisonment and ordered restitution in the amount of $1,500,000. Petitioner did not appeal, but did file a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 seeking to vacate, set aside or correct his sentence. The court dismissed the petition on July 18, 2019. On July 23, 2019, petitioner filed a new complaint for "mandamus" Doc. 40, seeking to have this court order the United States Attorney to support his S-Visa application because of petitioner's cooperation in a separate criminal matter. Although unrelated to his petition under 2255, petitioner filed his new complaint in the instant action. Because the request for mandamus relief is a new action, the Clerk is directed to take document 40 entitled "Complaint," open a new case with a new case number, direct petitioner to either pay a filing fee or file a petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") and send petitioner an IFP application. The instant case 18 C 5583 remains closed. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/31/2019. Mailed notice (pk, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by James O. Ademiju. (Exhibit)(Envelope postmarked 7/19/2019) (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ademiju v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O. Ademiju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Jeremy C. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?