Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund et al v. Plote Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund and Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund
Defendant: Plote Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05201
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund (Chapman, Catherine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund as to Plote Construction, Inc. on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Chapman, Catherine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
August 1, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Plote Construction, Inc. (ecw, )
August 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund by Catherine Marie Chapman (Chapman, Catherine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16095311. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chapman, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund et al v. Plote Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plote Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?