Huntington National Bank, The v. Stella's Real Estate, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank and Huntington National Bank, The
Defendant: Jeffery G. Winternheimer, Stella Winternheimer, Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association, Stella's Practice Management, LLC, 1751 Park East Office Condominium Association, Arlington Heights Medical, S.C., Orland Park Business Center Office Complex, Jeff G. Winternheimer, Stella's Real Estate, LLC, Stella's Real Estate, LLC Series A, Berwyn Medical, S.C., Countryview Medical Center, S.C., Orland Park Medical, S.C., Stella Zaimi Winternheimer, Enterprise Office Center Condominium Association and Stella's Real Estate, LLC - Series A
Case Number: 1:2019cv05240
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 29 RECEIVER'S BOND in the amount of $ 50,000 posted by The Huntington National Bank. (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED) (aee, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service Notice of Mailing by Andrew H. Eres on behalf of Huntington National Bank, The regarding Receiver's Bond by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The for bond Receivers Bond #27 (Eres, Andrew) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/13/2019 (ph, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 RECEIVERS BOND (Eres, Andrew). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 8/13/2019 (mc, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service Notice of Mailing by Andrew H. Eres on behalf of Huntington National Bank, The regarding order,,,,, set/reset hearings,,,, #25 (Eres, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER FOR NON-RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES. This order is not effective until the court has approved the receiver's bond in the amount of $50,000.00, which must be issued by a court-approved surety company and signed by a court-approved attorney-in-fact for the surety company. Plaintiff or the Receiver shall deliver the bond along with this order to chambers for approval. Plaintiff shall immediately forward a copy of this order to the defendant-mortgagor and defendants or any attorney who has filed an appearance on their behalf and file proof of service thereof with the court. The Receiver's first report shall cover the period from after approval of the bond through September 30, 2019. The Receiver's first report shall be filed on or before October 7, 2019. Objections, if any, to be filed by October 14, 2019. Courtesy copies to the court shall be delivered on or before October 15, 2019. This case is continued to October 22, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. in courtroom 1403 for a hearing on approval of the Receivers first report. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/12/2019. Mailed notice(rj, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for appointment of receiver #21 . Mailed notice (rj, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Assn. a/k/a Orland Park Business Center Office Complex on 08/08/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Huntington National Bank, The in support of motion to appoint receiver #21 (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The to appoint receiver (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Eres for presentment of before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/13/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Stella Winterheimer on 08/07/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Jeffery G. Winternheimber a/k/a Jeff G. Winternheimer on 08/07/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on 1751 Park East Office Condominium Association a/k/a 1751 Park East Condominium Association on 08/07/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Countryview Medical Center S.C. (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Stella's Real Estate LLC Series A on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Stella's Practice Management on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Stella's Real Estate LLC on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Orland Park Medical on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Berwyn Medical, S.C. on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Arlington Heights Medical, S.C. on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Enterprise Office Center Condominium Assn. on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The regarding Summons & Complaint served on Andrew Tecson on 08/06/19 (Eres, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
August 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 1751 Park East Office Condominium Association, Arlington Heights Medical, S.C., Berwyn Medical, S.C., Countryview Medical Center, S.C., Enterprise Office Center Condominium Association, Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association, Orland Park Medical, S.C., Stella's Practice Management, LLC, Stella's Real Estate, LLC, Stella's Real Estate, LLC Series A, Jeffery G. Winternheimer, Stella Winternheimer. (kb, )
August 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs re civil cover sheet #2 , complaint #1 (Eres, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Andrew H. Eres (Eres, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Ronald A. Damashek (Damashek, Ronald)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Kevin Vail Hunt (Hunt, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eres, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Huntington National Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16099677. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Eres, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntington National Bank, The v. Stella's Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery G. Winternheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Winternheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella's Practice Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1751 Park East Office Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington Heights Medical, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orland Park Business Center Office Complex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff G. Winternheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella's Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella's Real Estate, LLC Series A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berwyn Medical, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countryview Medical Center, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orland Park Medical, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Zaimi Winternheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Office Center Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella's Real Estate, LLC - Series A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Ronald A. Damashek
Represented By: Kevin Vail Hunt
Represented By: Andrew H. Eres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank, The
Represented By: Andrew H. Eres
Represented By: Kevin Vail Hunt
Represented By: Ronald A. Damashek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?