Brinley Holdings Inc et al v. Husch Blackwell LLP et al
Plaintiff: Brinley Holdings Inc and Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD
Defendant: Husch Blackwell LLP, Michael Cosby and Michael A Cosby
Case Number: 1:2019cv05242
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Brinley Holdings Inc, Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD in Opposition to motion to dismiss #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ellis, John)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 9/25/19. The parties are to exchange MIDP disclosures by 12/15/19; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 11/15/19; the deadline to amend the pleading and join parties is 2/28/20. Fact discovery shall close on 4/30/20. If the parties would like a settlement conference, they should contact the courtroom deputy. Status hearing set for 11/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS Report Jointly Submitted on behalf of parties filed by Brinley Holdings Inc, Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD (Ellis, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Ellis, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 shall be due by 9/27/19; reply due by 10/11/19. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on behalf of Defendants (Condella, Jackie)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael A Cosby, Husch Blackwell LLP by Jackie Christine Condella (Condella, Jackie)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on behalf of Defendants (Martin, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael A Cosby, Husch Blackwell LLP by Brian E. Martin (Martin, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on behalf of Defendants (Trucco, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Husch Blackwell LLP (Trucco, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Michael A Cosby, Husch Blackwell LLP in support of motion to dismiss #8 and Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint (Trucco, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendants' NOTICE of Motion by Michael T. Trucco for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Trucco, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Michael A Cosby, Husch Blackwell LLP to dismiss and Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint (Trucco, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael A Cosby, Husch Blackwell LLP by Michael T. Trucco (Trucco, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Brinley Holdings Inc, Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD regarding Complaint and Summons served on Defendant Michael Cosby on August 16, 2019 (Ellis, John)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Brinley Holdings Inc, Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD regarding Complaint and Summons served on Husch Blackwell on August 15, 2019 (Ellis, John)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Michael A Cosby, and Husch Blackwell LLP. (acm, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 9/25/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ellis, John)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD, Brinley Holdings Inc; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16100075.(Ellis, John)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinley Holdings Inc et al v. Husch Blackwell LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brinley Holdings Inc
Represented By: John C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freestream Aircraft (Bermuda) LTD
Represented By: John C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husch Blackwell LLP
Represented By: Michael T. Trucco
Represented By: Brian E. Martin
Represented By: Jackie Christine Condella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Cosby
Represented By: Michael T. Trucco
Represented By: Brian E. Martin
Represented By: Jackie Christine Condella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?