Aldridge v. St. James Francincas et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aldridge
Defendant: Patient Siter X, Nurse X, St. James Francincas and Doctor X
Case Number: 1:2019cv05304
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER dated 9/23/19: This Standing Order applies to all civil cases reassigned to the calendar of District Judge Steven C. Seeger. All previously-set status or motion hearing dates are vacated. Any trials set for September 23, 2019 through October 31, 2019 are cancelled and will be re-set by the Court. Unless otherwise ordered, all other previously-set deadlines and schedules remain intact. The Court will set a date for a reassignment status conference after the parties have filed the joint status report. The Court will address already-pending motions at that conference. The parties are directed not to notice or re-notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, before appearing at the reassignment status conference. All emergency motions arising before September 30, 2019 should be noticed before the emergency judge. For all emergency motions arising after September 30, 2019, but before the date of the reassignment conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers at (312) 435-5588. Emergency matters must be true emergencies, meaning that a delay in hearing them would cause serious and irreparable harm to one or more of the parties. To help the Court learn about the case, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report by October 1, 2019. If defense counsel has not yet filed an appearance, plaintiff's counsel should prepare the status report. The report shall contain the information requested in the Initial Status Report For Reassigned Case. A Word version of the Initial Status Report is available on Judge Seeger's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties must deliver two (2) copies of the Initial Status Report to the courtroom deputy's drop-box outside room 1728 by October 2, 2019. (See order for further details.) Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 9/23/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Therefore, in light of the reassignment, all pending dates before this court are stricken. Parties to take note of Judge Seeger's standing order posted on his webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0029 - Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 12, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Steven Seeger; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Steven Seeger; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Stevens webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Steven Seeger to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/16/2019.(mma, )
August 27, 2019 MAILED Order dated 8/27/2019 with a blank IFP application to the Plaintiff at 21539 Olivia Avenue, Sauk Village, IL 60411. (jh, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: According to the Illinois Department of Corrections web site, Plaintiff was released on parole on July 31, 2019, around the same time or just after he filed this lawsuit. To proceed with this case, Plaintiff must submit both: (1) written notification of his current address, and (2) an updated in forma pauperis (IFP) application showing his financial and employment status so the Court can assess his current ability to pay the filing fee. Robbins v. Switzer, 104 F.3d 895, 897-98 (7th Cir. 1997). The Clerk of Court shall send this order and another IFP application to Plaintiff at his last known address, as reflected on the docket, and to 21539 Olivia Avenue, Sauk Village, IL 60411, the last known home address the Court has recorded in its files. Plaintiff's failure to comply with both directives of this order by October 15, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.3(f); Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016) ("district courts have the inherent authority to manage their dockets and courtrooms with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases"). Plaintiff's current motion to proceed IFP #3 , as well as his motion for an attorney #4 , are denied without prejudice to renewal if Plaintiff complies with this order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/27/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Jeffrey Aldridge for attorney representation (bg, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jeffrey Aldridge for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (bg, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Jeffrey Aldridge (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope postmarked 7/25/2019) (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge v. St. James Francincas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patient Siter X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. James Francincas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?