Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC v. Village of University Park
Plaintiff: Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC
Defendant: Village of University Park
Case Number: 1:2019cv05309
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendant's unopposed extension motion #13 to answer is granted to 10/14/2019, in an effort to accommodate the settlement discussions. But the litigation track must begin if a settlement is not reached by the next status hearing date. The status hearing of 10/09/2019 is reset to 10/23/2019 at 10:30 a.m., with the joint initial status report due by 10/16/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by John Patrick Wise for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/3/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Wise, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Village of University Park for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 Agreed Motion (Wise, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Defendants unopposed extension motion #10 to answer or respond is granted to 09/30/2019. The status hearing of 09/11/2019 is reset to 10/09/2019 at 9 a.m., with the joint status report, R. 7, due by 10/02/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by John Patrick Wise for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/4/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Wise, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Village of University Park for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Wise, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of University Park by John Patrick Wise (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wise, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of University Park by Matthew Martin Welch (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Welch, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 09/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC as to Village of University Park on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Vallas, David)
August 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Village of University Park (mc, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
August 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC by Sohil M. Shah (Shah, Sohil)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC by Mark J Nora (Nora, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC by David P Vallas (Vallas, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16110858. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Vallas, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC v. Village of University Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of University Park
Represented By: Matthew Martin Welch
Represented By: John Patrick Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colfin 2019-H Industrial Owner, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Nora
Represented By: Sohil M. Shah
Represented By: David P Vallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?