Alesi v. Signet Jewelers
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Alesi
Defendant: Signet Jewelers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05409
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to amended complaint and Defendant's Defenses by Signet Jewelers, Inc.(Manuel, Katherine)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 1/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. MIDP due 10/28/2019; fact discovery to be completed by 4/30/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Lisa M. Alesi (Smith, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Lisa M. Alesi against Signet Jewelers, Inc. (FILED PURSUANT TO FRCP 15(a)(2)) (Smith, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Signet Jewelers, Inc. by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Signet Jewelers, Inc. (Manuel, Katherine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Signet Jewelers, Inc.(Manuel, Katherine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Signet Jewelers, Inc. by Katherine A. Manuel (Manuel, Katherine)
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 9/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
August 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Signet Jewelers, Inc. (kb, )
August 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
August 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Alesi by Michael T. Smith (Smith, Michael)
August 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lisa Alesi; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16125940. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alesi v. Signet Jewelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Alesi
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signet Jewelers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Vincent Furlong
Represented By: Katherine A. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?