Carrillo v. Nerheim et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Carrillo
Defendant: Michael G. Nerheim, Lake County and Roderick Drobinski
Case Number: 1:2019cv05454
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time #5 is granted. The deadline for either (1) paying the filing fee or submitting a renewed IFP application or (2) filing a motion for voluntary dismissal is extended to November 12, 2019. Failure to comply by the new deadline will result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/3/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Manuel Carrillo to extend deadline for re-filing informa pauperis petition (Envelope postmarked 9/9/2019) (Received for docketing 9/19/2019) (sxb, )
August 28, 2019 MAILED a blank IFP application and a copy of the order dated 8/28/2019 #4 to plaintiff Manuel Carrillo (sxb, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") #3 is denied, without prejudice. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a renewed IFP application that is certified by a trust fund officer; he must also attach copies of facility trust fund ledgers showing his income for the six months preceding the initiation of this action (that is, from February 13, 2019, through August 13, 2019). Failure to comply by September 27, 2019, will result in denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis and summary dismissal of this case. The Court instructs the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a blank IFP application along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/28/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Manuel Carrillo for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Manuel Carrillo (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 8/7/2019)(sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo v. Nerheim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Nerheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Drobinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?