Allen v. Board of Trustees Rock Valley College et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Allen
Defendant: Lisa Mehlig, Joe Simpson, Douglas Jensen, Lisa DuSavage and Board of Trustees Rock Valley College
Case Number: 1:2019cv05465
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS Report (Joint) by Board of Trustees Rock Valley College, Lisa DuSavage, Douglas Jensen, Lisa Mehlig, Joe Simpson (Noll, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melvin Allen. All Defendants. (Frederick, Calvita)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Board of Trustees Rock Valley College, Lisa DuSavage, Douglas Jensen, Lisa Mehlig, Joe Simpson by Frank Bennett Garrett, III (Garrett, Frank)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Board of Trustees Rock Valley College, Lisa DuSavage, Douglas Jensen, Lisa Mehlig, Joe Simpson by Kevin Paul Noll (Noll, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 10/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melvin Allen by Calvita J. Frederick (Frederick, Calvita)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Frederick, Calvita)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melvin Allen; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16134691. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A Simpson Letter, #2 Exhibit Exh B Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit Exh D Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit Exh D Right to Sue)(Frederick, Calvita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Board of Trustees Rock Valley College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mehlig
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Represented By: Kevin Paul Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Simpson
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Represented By: Kevin Paul Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Jensen
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Represented By: Kevin Paul Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa DuSavage
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Represented By: Kevin Paul Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees Rock Valley College
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Represented By: Kevin Paul Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Allen
Represented By: Calvita J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?