Kochevar v. Anovitz Associates, Inc.
Appellant: Michael David Kochevar
Appellee: Anovitz Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05473
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 FINAL closing order dated 09/09/2019 entered on USBC docket. (aee, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) and Agreed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal #6 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew E McClintock for presentment of motion to dismiss #6 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (McClintock, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Appellant Michael David Kochevar to dismiss appeal (McClintock, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction regarding docket entry #4 (pk, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED in error (pk, ) Modified on 8/15/2019 (pk, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, )
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 7/30/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Rivera, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 A 785 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kochevar v. Anovitz Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael David Kochevar
Represented By: Daniel Charles Curth
Represented By: Matthew E McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anovitz Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. D'Agostino
Represented By: Robert R. Benjamin
Represented By: Beverly Anne Berneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?