Deneen et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul J. Munoz, AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin K Munoz, Michael J. Deneen, Paul Munoz and Erin Munoz
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05499
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Michael J. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin Munoz, Paul Munoz (Prossnitz, Howard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Michael J. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin Munoz, Paul Munoz for extension of time Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Answer or Plead (Prossnitz, Howard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended complaint #10 is granted. Mailed notice (is, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Howard Brian Prossnitz for presentment of motion to amend/correct, #10 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Prossnitz, Howard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Michael J. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin Munoz, Paul Munoz to amend/correct complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Prossnitz, Howard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney David S. Sager's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 on behalf of the defendant is granted. Mailed notice (is, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16313914. On Behalf of Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (David, Sager)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. by Yan Grinblat (Grinblat, Yan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. by Raj Niranjan Shah (Shah, Raj)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Michael J. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin K Munoz, Paul J. Munoz by Adam Szulczewski (Szulczewski, Adam)
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Michael J. Deneen, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, Erin K Munoz, Paul J. Munoz by Howard Brian Prossnitz (Prossnitz, Howard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Prossnitz, Howard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Erin K Munoz, Nazret Z. Gebremeskel, AnnaMarie V. Deneen, Paul J. Munoz, Michael J. Deneen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16137871. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, #2 Exhibit D, E, #3 Exhibit F, G, #4 Exhibit H, Part One, #5 Exhibit H, Part Two, #6 Exhibit I)(Prossnitz, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deneen et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Yan Grinblat
Represented By: Raj Niranjan Shah
Represented By: David S. Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Munoz
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnnaMarie V. Deneen
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazret Z. Gebremeskel
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin K Munoz
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Deneen
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Munoz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Munoz
Represented By: Adam Szulczewski
Represented By: Howard Brian Prossnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?