Post Media Systems LLC v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Post Media Systems LLC
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05539
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 10/31/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Clifford)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/2019. (mma, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Post Media Systems LLC as to Google LLC on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Benchell, Neil)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Google LLC. (lw, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (rp, )
August 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC by Clifford Chad Henson (Henson, Clifford)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henson, Clifford)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Post Media Systems LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16146134. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 AO-120 Patent Report)(Henson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post Media Systems LLC v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post Media Systems LLC
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Represented By: Clifford Chad Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?