Byra v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kasia Byra
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A., Inc American Airlines, American Airlines, Inc. and Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A. Operadora Unipersonal
Case Number: 1:2019cv05545
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant, American Airlines, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by American Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Sidkey, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Katherine Courtney Gustin (Gustin, Katherine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. by Robert Emin Sidkey (Sidkey, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Kasia Byra regarding Summons and Complaint served on American Airlines, Inc. on 8/21/2019 (Ports, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants American Airlines, Inc., and Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A. Operadora Unipersonal. (acm, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 10/17/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kasia Byra; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16145958. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cundiff, Corinne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byra v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc American Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Courtney Gustin
Represented By: Robert Emin Sidkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana, S.A. Operadora Unipersonal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasia Byra
Represented By: Corinne M Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?