Collins v. Chicago Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Isis O. Collins
Defendant: Chicago Transit Authority and Georgette Hampton
Case Number: 1:2019cv05591
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chicago Transit Authority on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (jh, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Georgette Hampton on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (jh, )
September 23, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Transit Authority, Georgette Hampton with a certified copy of Order dated 9/20/2019 to the U.S. Marshal Service via email. (jh, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Isis O. Collins. (Exhibits) (jh, )
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Status hearing held on 9/20/2019. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the complaint and issue summons for service by the U.S. Marshal Service. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each defendant being served, if she has not done so. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/20/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is set for 9/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/2019.(jh, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Isis O. Collins for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Isis O. Collins. (jh, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Isis O. Collins. (Exhibits) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Chicago Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isis O. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgette Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?