Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership v. SB Winnetka, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership
Defendant: Village of Winnetka, Fox Valley Fire & Safety, SB Winnetka, LLC, Signature Bank, David M. Trandel, Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC, SB One Winnetka, LLC, Evans Construction/Consulting LLC, T2 Winnetka I, LLC, JAR Corp a/k/a Paint Jar Inc., Sowlat Engineers, P.C. d/b/a Sowlat Structural Engineers, JAR Corp, Sowlat Engineers, P.C., Unknown Owners and Unknown and Non-Record Claimants, Fox Valley Fire & Safety Co. and Paint Jar Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Sadoff Enterprises, T.L.O.A. of Il, Scribe Funding, A.T.C.F. II Tax Service Cust, Fig Il 18, Elm Street Pharmacy, LLC, First American Bank and Stonestreet Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05610
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Winnetka by Peter Michael Friedman (Friedman, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Winnetka by Andrew Nicholas Fiske (Fiske, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD party complaint by Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. against Unknown Owners and Unknown and Non-Record Claimants, Evans Construction/Consulting LLC, T2 Winnetka I, LLC, Elm Street Pharmacy, LLC, T.L.O.A. of Il, First American Bank, Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC, Sowlat Engineers, P.C., SB Winnetka, LLC, Sadoff Enterprises, Stonestreet Partners, LLC, Village of Winnetka, SB One Winnetka, LLC, Scribe Funding, A.T.C.F. II Tax Service Cust, Fig Il 18 ., CROSSCLAIM by Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. against Evans Construction/Consulting LLC, T2 Winnetka I, LLC, Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC, Sowlat Engineers, P.C., SB Winnetka, LLC, Village of Winnetka, SB One Winnetka, LLC ., COUNTERCLAIM filed by Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. against Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership . by Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing)(Lillig, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Winnetka by William Foster Farley (Farley, William)
October 16, 2019 Filing 52 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 25,000 posted by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. (aee, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 51 Verified ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by JAR Corp against SB One Winnetka, LLC ., COUNTERCLAIM filed by JAR Corp against All Parties . by JAR Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Kaufman, David)
October 16, 2019 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. T2 Winnetka I, LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 16, 2019 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure (Lis Pendens), Notice of Motion, Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Merisol Murphy on behalf of Signature Bank on August 28, 2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
October 15, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Agreed motions for extension of time #35 #46 are both granted. Due date for Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc.'s response to the complaint is extended to 10/18/2019; due date for T2 Winnetka I, LLC's response to the complaint is extended to 11/4/2019. (mk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion by Edward Francis Malone for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #46 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Malone, Edward)
October 15, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION by Defendant T2 Winnetka I, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Agreed (Malone, Edward)
October 15, 2019 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T2 Winnetka I, LLC by Edward Francis Malone (Malone, Edward)
October 10, 2019 Filing 44 AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/10/2019. (mk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Paint Jar, Inc.'s motion for extension of time #37 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 10/16/2019. (mk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JAR Corp by David Alan Kaufman (Kaufman, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by O Allan Fridman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #37 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fridman, O)
October 2, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JAR Corp by O Allan Fridman (Fridman, O)
October 2, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JAR Corp by O Allan Fridman for David Kaufman (Fridman, O)
October 2, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by O Allan Fridman for presentment of (Fridman, O)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant JAR Corp for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Fridman, O)
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by John C. Lillig for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #35 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lillig, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lillig, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. SB Winnetka, LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. SB One Winnetka, LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. Village of Winnetka waiver sent on 8/25/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on David M. Trandel on 9/5/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on JAR Corp. a/k/a Paint Jar Inc. on 8/27/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Fox Valley Fire & Safety Co. on 8/27/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Okrent Kisiel Associates Inc. on 8/26/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Sowlat Engineers PC on 8/26/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Evans Construction/Consulting LLC on 8/26/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Notice of Foreclosure, Notice and Motion for Appointment of Receiver served on Lucien LaGrange Studio on 8/27/2019 (Hamilton, Demetria)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC by Ronald J. Broida (Broida, Ronald)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Evans Construction/Consulting LLC by Ronald J. Broida (Broida, Ronald)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/11/2019. Motion to appoint receiver #8 is granted subject to submission of an agreed order to be sent to Judge Kennelly's proposed order email address. Initial status hearing is set for 10/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Deadline for defendant Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc.'s response to complaint is extended to 10/4/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC by Joseph K. Nichele Ronald J. Broida (Nichele, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC by Joseph K. Nichele Joseph K. Nichele (Nichele, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Evans Construction/Consulting LLC by Joseph K. Nichele Ronald J. Broida (Nichele, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Evans Construction/Consulting LLC by Joseph K. Nichele (Nichele, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/3/2019. By agreement of the parties, motion for appointment of receiver #8 is entered and continued to 9/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SB One Winnetka, LLC by Thomas R Fawkes (Fawkes, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SB Winnetka, LLC by Thomas R Fawkes (Fawkes, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. by Kevin J. Todd (Todd, Kevin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. by Richard D. Boonstra (Boonstra, Richard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc. by John C. Lillig (Lillig, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership (DeJonker, Jason)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership (DeJonker, Jason)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Jon DeJonker for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/3/2019 at 09:30 AM. (DeJonker, Jason)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership to appoint receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A through E)(DeJonker, Jason)
August 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants David M. Trandel, Evans Construction/Consulting LLC, Fox Valley Fire & Safety, JAR Corp a/k/a Paint Jar Inc., Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC, Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc., SB One Winnetka, LLC, SB Winnetka, LLC, Signature Bank, Sowlat Engineers, P.C. d/b/a Sowlat Structural Engineers, T2 Winnetka I, LLC, Village of Winnetka. (lw, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED REDACTED Exhibits to Complaint Dkt. 1 by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership (Hamilton, Demetria)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTED Exhibits to Complaint Dkt. 1 by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership (Hamilton, Demetria)
August 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Demetria)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Demetria Hamilton (Hamilton, Demetria)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Aaron E. Davis (Davis, Aaron)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Jason Jon DeJonker (DeJonker, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT / VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16155656. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s 1 through 13)(DeJonker, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership v. SB Winnetka, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Winnetka
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Fiske
Represented By: William Foster Farley
Represented By: Peter Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Valley Fire & Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Winnetka, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R Fawkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Trandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucien LaGrange Studio, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Broida
Represented By: Joseph K. Nichele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB One Winnetka, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R Fawkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Construction/Consulting LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Broida
Represented By: Joseph K. Nichele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T2 Winnetka I, LLC
Represented By: Edward Francis Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAR Corp a/k/a Paint Jar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sowlat Engineers, P.C. d/b/a Sowlat Structural Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAR Corp
Represented By: David Alan Kaufman
Represented By: O Allan Fridman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sowlat Engineers, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Unknown and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Valley Fire & Safety Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paint Jar Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Kaufman
Represented By: O Allan Fridman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Okrent Kisiel Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Lillig
Represented By: Richard D. Boonstra
Represented By: Kevin J. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership
Represented By: Demetria Hamilton
Represented By: Aaron E. Davis
Represented By: Jason Jon DeJonker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sadoff Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: T.L.O.A. of Il
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scribe Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: A.T.C.F. II Tax Service Cust, Fig Il 18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Elm Street Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: First American Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Stonestreet Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?