Dandridge v. Hudson
Petitioner: Delmond Maurice Dandridge, Jr
Respondent: D. Hudson, AUSP Thomson and Donald Hudson
Case Number: 1:2019cv05634
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Delmond Dandridge (Envelope postmarked 10/10/2019; Institutional postmark 10/10/2019). (sxb, )
September 16, 2019 MAILED a blank in forma pauperis application form and a copy of the order dated 9/16/2019 #4 to plaintiff Delmond Maurice Dandridge, Jr (sxb, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Petitioner is given until October 7, 2019 to either pay the $5 filing fee or file a petition for leave to file in forma pauperis. Petitioner is warned that the Court may dismiss this case if he fails to comply with this order. The Clerk is instructed to (1) update the docket to reflect that Respondent is Donald Hudson, Warden, AUSP Thomson; and, (2) send Petitioner a blank in forma pauperis application form. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/16/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Petitioner Delmond Maurice Dandridge, Jr for injunction relief (sxb, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Delmond Maurice Dandridge, Jr against AUSP Thomson, D. Hudson (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dandridge v. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delmond Maurice Dandridge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Hudson
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AUSP Thomson
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?