Hurt v. Mississippi John Hurt Foundation

Plaintiff: Sterling Conley Hurt
Defendant: Mississippi John Hurt Foundation
Case Number: 1:2019cv05662
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (mma, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED from Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01722 (mma)
August 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Aug 21 15:25:47 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ACCEPTING 8 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND TRANSFERRING CASE re: #7 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division. The Eastern Division of the Northern District of Illinois appears to be a proper venue for this action under 28 U.S.C. 1391(b), the Court also GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to transfer this action under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) and 1631. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/21/2019) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to 8 Findings and Recommendations and Request to Transfer by Sterling Conley Hurt. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 8. Fri Jul 26 09:54:33 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Sterling Conley Hurt. (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Jul 22 16:42:43 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Jul 18 16:17:39 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sterling Conley Hurt. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Conley Hurt. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Mississippi John Hurt Foundation filed by Sterling Conley Hurt. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. Mississippi John Hurt Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi John Hurt Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Conley Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?