Santiago et al v. Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ralph Santiago, A-1 Jewelry, LLC and John Polo
Defendant: ADT LLC, Underwriters Laboratories, Inc., Western Resources, Inc., ADT Inc., Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc. and Apollo Global Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv05689
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Riley C. Mendoza for presentment of motion to dismiss #27 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by ADT LLC in support of motion to dismiss #27 ADT LLC's Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mendoza, Riley)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant ADT LLC to dismiss ADT LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Mendoza, Riley)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by ADT LLC (Mendoza, Riley)
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS Report ADT LLC's Status Report by ADT LLC (Mendoza, Riley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant ADT LLC. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #21 is granted. The time for Defendant to respond to the operative complaint is extended to 10/21/2019. Motion hearing set for 10/7/2019 #22 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Riley C. Mendoza for presentment of extension of time #21 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant ADT LLC for extension of time ADT LLC's Motion for extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E to Motion for Extension)(Mendoza, Riley)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint #18 , which is his one amendment of right under Civil Rule 15(a)(1). Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint by 10/7/2019. Motion for judgment on the pleadings #11 is denied as moot.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 APPENDIX amended complaint #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits in support of complaint)(Neely, David)
September 22, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED complaint by Ralph Santiago against ADT LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Neely, David) (Linked document has the incorrect case number.)( Docket text modified on 9/23/2019 by Clerk's Office).
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 10/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendant Protection One/ADT's motion for judgment on the pleadings #11 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion (or file an amended complaint) by 10/7/2019; if Plaintiffs respond to the motion, Defendant shall reply by 10/21/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion and status hearing set for 9/10/2019 #11 is stricken and re-set for 9/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion and status hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #11 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Defendant ADT's jurisdictional addendum #10 having established, at least for pleading purposes, that the parties are completely diverse, the order to show cause #8 is discharged. MIDP disclosures shall be served by 10/1/2019. The status hearing set for 9/9/2019 is stricken and re-set for 9/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report using the form on Judge Feinerman's webpage on the District's website by 10/16/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Riley C. Mendoza for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings #11 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mendoza, Riley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by ADT LLC in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings #11 (Mendoza, Riley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant ADT LLC for judgment on the pleadings (Mendoza, Riley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 ADT LLC's Jurisdictional Addendum to Notice of Removal by ADT Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mendoza, Riley)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 ADT LLC f/k/a Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint TO VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.(Mendoza, Riley)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant is ordered to show cause in writing by 9/6/2019 why this case should not be remanded to state court for want of subject matter jurisdiction. The body of the operative complaint identifies A-1 Jewelry, LLC as a party plaintiff, but the notice of removal does not properly allege the citizenship of Plaintiff A-1 Jewelry, LLC. Defendant may show cause by filing a Jurisdictional Addendum that properly alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff A-1 Jewelry, LLC.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
August 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (td, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ADT LLC ADT LLC's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mendoza, Riley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADT LLC by Riley C. Mendoza (Mendoza, Riley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mendoza, Riley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019CH00574) filed by ADT LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16169359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mendoza, Riley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago et al v. Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Santiago
Represented By: David E. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A-1 Jewelry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Polo
Represented By: David E. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Global Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?