Durr v. Lamiline Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Durr
Defendant: Lamiline Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05695
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, has paid the filing fee. The Court sets this case for an initial status hearing / scheduling conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on October 24, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Kennelly's courtroom (Room 2188). Plaintiff is ordered to appear, and defendant is ordered to appear if it has been served with summons by that date. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/30/2019. Mailed notice (lma, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Durr as to Lamiline Inc. on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (pj, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lamiline Inc. (kp, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Stephen Durr. (kp, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Durr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of documents cited) (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durr v. Lamiline Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamiline Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Durr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?