Miklos et al v. City of Berwyn
Plaintiff: David J Miklos and RDB Property, LLC
Defendant: City of Berwyn
Case Number: 1:2019cv05700
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P. 12(b)(6) #10 is entered and briefed and follows: Response is due by 11/5/2019; Reply is due by 11/19/2019. In court ruling is set for 1/9/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 10/29/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 with certificate of service NOTICE of Motion by Cynthia Sara Grandfield for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Berwyn (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant City's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 6(b)(1)(A) by 10/9/2019 #7 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/1/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Cynthia Sara Grandfield for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City of Berwyn for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 9:30 a.m. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Berwyn by Cynthia Sara Grandfield (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Berwyn by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.)
August 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Berwyn. (lw, )
August 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David J Miklos, RDB Property, LLC by Steven S. Shonder (Shonder, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shonder, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Relief Under the Takings Clause filed by David J Miklos, RDB Property, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16171451.(Shonder, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miklos et al v. City of Berwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J Miklos
Represented By: Steven S. Shonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RDB Property, LLC
Represented By: Steven S. Shonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berwyn
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?