Sussen v. Madla
Plaintiff: Terry Sussen
Defendant: Virginia Madla
Case Number: 1:2019cv05712
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Virginia Madla(Shinkan, Scott)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Honorable Ruben Castillo has elected to retire effective September 27, 2019; and It further appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Ruben Castillo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/30/2019.(sm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #5 is granted to and including 10/1/2019. Noticed motion date of 9/25/2019 is stricken as moot. Mailed notice (mw, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Virginia Madla by Robert Lee Reifenberg (AMENDED) (Reifenberg, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Virginia Madla by Robert Lee Reifenberg (Reifenberg, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Scott Robert Shinkan for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Shinkan, Scott)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Virginia Madla for extension of time to file answer [Unopposed] (Shinkan, Scott)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Virginia Madla by Scott Robert Shinkan (Shinkan, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
August 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Virginia Madla. (lw, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terry Sussen by Patrick L. Provenzale (Provenzale, Patrick)
August 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terry Sussen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16173765. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Provenzale, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sussen v. Madla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Madla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sussen
Represented By: Patrick L. Provenzale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?