Oberoi v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sabita Oberoi
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05822
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The order entered this date (dkt. 8) is amended to say that the status hearing is set for 11/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The order otherwise remains unchanged. Mailed notice (reg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The parties shall promptly consult with each other on the following topics: 1) Do they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge; or 2) Do they agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner. Status hearing is set for 11/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If the parties agree to consent or remand they may notify the court prior to the status hearing and no appearance will be required. Mailed notice (reg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Honorable Ruben Castillo has elected to retire effective September 27, 2019; and It further appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Honorable Ruben Castillo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/30/2019.(sm, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Snodgrass, Douglas)
August 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabita Oberoi by Elise D Crawley (Crawley, Elise)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabita Oberoi by Beth A. Alpert (Alpert, Beth)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sabita Oberoi by Marcie E. Goldbloom (Goldbloom, Marcie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Goldbloom, Marcie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sabita Oberoi; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16189135.(Goldbloom, Marcie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oberoi v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabita Oberoi
Represented By: Elise D Crawley
Represented By: Marcie E. Goldbloom
Represented By: Beth A. Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Douglas G. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?