Boffoli v. Jansma
Plaintiff: Mr. Christopher Boffoli
Defendant: Andrew Jansma
Case Number: 1:2019cv05892
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 12/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 10/24/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 23, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Andrew Jansma (mc, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. (vcf, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(las, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Christopher Boffoli (Saper, Daliah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Request letter to Plaintiff's counsel to Daliah Saper (las, )
September 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Boffoli by Matthew Richard Grothouse (Grothouse, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Boffoli; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16197590.(Saper, Daliah)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saper, Daliah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boffoli v. Jansma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jansma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Christopher Boffoli
Represented By: Matthew Richard Grothouse
Represented By: Daliah Saper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?