United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Daubenspeck et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Geoffrey L. Homer and Keith G. Daubenspeck
Case Number: 1:2019cv05939
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 11/1/19 is stricken and reset to 11/13/19 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Geoffrey L. Homer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Munro, Andrew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case having been terminated in error on 10/1/2019 is hereby reopened. Status hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Keith DaubenspeckS Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/1/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Agreed motion for entry of final judgment, by consent, as to Defendant Keith Daubenspeck #3 is granted. Enter Final Judgment as to Defendant Keith Daubenspeck. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keith G. Daubenspeck by James L. Kopecky (Kopecky, James)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Geoffrey L. Homer by Andrew J Munro (Munro, Andrew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission by Richard Gregory Stoltz (Stoltz, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Geoffrey L. Homer waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hanauer, Benjamin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin J Hanauer for presentment of motion to approve consent judgment #3 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hanauer, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission to approve consent judgment AGREED MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment)(Hanauer, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission by Benjamin J Hanauer (Hanauer, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanauer, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Daubenspeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Benjamin J Hanauer
Represented By: Richard Gregory Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey L. Homer
Represented By: Andrew J Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith G. Daubenspeck
Represented By: James L. Kopecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?