Page et al v. Alliant Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Muniz, Carmel Cooper and Alicia M Page
Defendant: Alliant Credit Union and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 1:2019cv05965
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Emily Jo Kirk for presentment of motion to continue #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/6/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Kirk, Emily)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Carmel Cooper, Cindy Muniz, Alicia M Page to continue RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26 JOINT REPORT FILING DATE [UNCONTESTED] (Kirk, Emily)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alicia M Page, Cindy Muniz, Carmel Cooper. Alliant Credit Union waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Kirk, Emily)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 , #7 , #8 , and #9 are granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16241183. (Suh, Roy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16240798. (Kihiczak, Taras)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16223731. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wright, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 11/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16213380. (McCune, Richard)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Alliant Credit Union (mc, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
September 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Carmel Cooper, Cindy Muniz, Alicia M Page by Emily Jo Kirk (Kirk, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kirk, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION filed by Alicia M Page, Cindy Muniz, Carmel Cooper; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16209366. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Alliant 2016 Form 990), #2 Exhibit "B" (Alliant Fee Schedule), #3 Exhibit "C" (Alliant Opt In Contract), #4 Exhibit "D" (Alliant 2013 Account Agreement), #5 Exhibit "E" (Alliant 2013 Account Agreement), #6 Exhibit "F" (Credit Union 1 Opt In Contract), #7 Exhibit "G" (EECU Opt In Contract))(Kirk, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page et al v. Alliant Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Muniz
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Taras Kihiczak
Represented By: Roy K. Suh
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Cooper
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Taras Kihiczak
Represented By: Roy K. Suh
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia M Page
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Taras Kihiczak
Represented By: Roy K. Suh
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?