White v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stacy B White
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05988
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to file (doc. #10 ) is granted; no appearance on the motion is required. Defendant is given an extension of time for leave to file his administrative record, as his answer to plaintiff's complaint, or otherwise please, pursuant to Local Rule 8.1 (b) by no later than 5:00 p.m. on or before 12/05/19. Mailed notice. (jj, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 (Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by Kathryn Ann Kelly for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes on 11/7/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Kelly, Kathryn)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed) (Kelly, Kathryn)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The case has been reassigned to this Court on consent (doc. #8). Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. #5) is granted. In accordance with Local Rule 16.4, after the filing of the Administrative Record, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Fuentes' standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Fuentes' webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes on 10/30/2019. Mailed notice(smm, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/28/19.(smm, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Brown, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Saul (Kelly, Kathryn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Stacy B White for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Brown, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: This action was filed on 9/6/2019 and the filing fee hasn't been paid nor has an informa pauperis application been submitted to the Court. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file an informa pauperis petition by 10/16/2019. Failure to pay the filing fee or file an informa pauperis petition by 10/16/2019 will result in dismissal of this action. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stacy B White by James P. Brown (Brown, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Stacy B White; (Brown, James) Modified on 9/9/2019 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy B White
Represented By: James P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?