EEOC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: EEOC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06021
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Minute entry #7 is amended to correct the time of the status hearing. Initial status conference in this matter is set for 11/21/2019 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 11/21/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/14/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by EEOC. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 9/16/2009, answer due 11/15/2009. (Fiorito, Bradley)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
September 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff EEOC by Bradley S. Fiorito (Fiorito, Bradley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fiorito, Bradley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by EEOC; Jury Demand. (Fiorito, Bradley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff EEOC by Gregory M. Gochanour (Gochanour, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Bradley S. Fiorito
Represented By: Gregory M. Gochanour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?