Tribuzio v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rose Tribuzio
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06046
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Szaflarski, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Kristen Elise Rau as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Rau, Kristen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Tribuzio by Mark G. Szaflarski Amended Appearance (Szaflarski, Mark)
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED complaint by Rose Tribuzio against Andrew Marshall Saul to correct typo (Szaflarski, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED complaint by Rose Tribuzio against Rose Tribuzio to correct typo (Szaflarski, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Tribuzio by Mark G. Szaflarski (Szaflarski, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rose Tribuzio; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16218945. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szaflarski, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tribuzio v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Tribuzio
Represented By: Mark G. Szaflarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?