Ward v. Consequence Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Ward
Defendant: Alexander Young and Consequence Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06050
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 12/23/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 1/6/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jesse Ward by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: The Executive Committee, which administers the bar of this Court, notes the following: on August 8, 2019, attorney Richard Liebowitz applied for a pro hac vice efiling account in this Court. After obtaining the account, Mr. Liebowitz used the account to file the first of 12 cases electronically. In each of the cases, the filing fee was paid, but neither appearance forms nor pro hac vice petitions were filed. Local Rule 83.14; 83.16. For now, the Executive Committee posts this entry for the information and potential action of the assigned district judges in each case. Mailed notice. (sm, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (aee, )
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jesse Ward; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16219436. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Consequence Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consequence Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Ward
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?