Barbaccia v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Daniel Barbaccia
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06054
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. A briefing schedule will be set after the Administrative Record is filed. Mailed notice (ber, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/4/2019. (sxb, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Joint Consent #8 having been filed, the Court strikes status hearing set for 11/12/19. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Snodgrass, Douglas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Snodgrass, Douglas)
October 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (yt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 11/12/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/5/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Entered in Error (Conick, Harold) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT paid receipt #0752-16221325 filed by Rodolfo Daniel Barbaccia; (Conick, Harold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rodolfo Daniel Barbaccia by Harold William Conick (Conick, Harold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16221325. (Conick, Harold)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Conick, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbaccia v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Daniel Barbaccia
Represented By: Harold William Conick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Douglas G. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?