Longwell v. Social Scene LLC
Plaintiff: Laura Longwell
Defendant: Social Scene LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06074
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 11/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The 11/5/2019 motion hearings #10 #13 are stricken. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time and for continuance #11 is granted in part. The time for Plaintiff to comply with the Local Rules regarding trial counsel and appearances is extended to 11/19/2019. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal with prejudice of this case for want of prosecution. Motion to appear telephonically at the 10/23/2019 conference #14 is granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Correction regarding #10 , #11 , #13 , #14 (sxb, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell for leave to appear as Telephonic at October 23 conference #13 (Liebowitz, Richard) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Plaintiff Laura Longwell for leave to appear as Telephonic at October 23 conference (Liebowitz, Richard) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Social Scene LLC by Natalie Anne Harris (Harris, Natalie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell for extension of time to comply with local rulesMOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell to continue hearing scheduled for October 23, 2019 #10 (Liebowitz, Richard) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Plaintiff Laura Longwell for extension of time to comply with local rules, MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell to continue hearing scheduled for October 23, 2019 (Liebowitz, Richard) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to continue #7 is denied for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b). Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Laura Longwell by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell to continue , MOTION by Plaintiff Laura Longwell for extension of time comply with local rules (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Longwell as to Social Scene LLC on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: The Executive Committee, which administers the bar of this Court, notes the following: on August 8, 2019, attorney Richard Liebowitz applied for a pro hac vice efiling account in this Court. After obtaining the account, Mr. Liebowitz used the account to file the first of 12 cases electronically. In each of the cases, the filing fee was paid, but neither appearance forms nor pro hac vice petitions were filed. Local Rule 83.14; 83.16. For now, the Executive Committee posts this entry for the information and potential action of the assigned district judges in each case. Mailed notice. (sm, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has until 10/15/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15. Status hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (sxb, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
September 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laura Longwell; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16224180. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longwell v. Social Scene LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Longwell
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Scene LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?