Chapter 4 Corp. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Chapter 4 Corp.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv06131
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Chapter 4 Corp. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chapter 4 Corp. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
November 8, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chapter 4 Corp. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
November 8, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chapter 4 Corp. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
October 25, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chapter 4 Corp. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
October 17, 2019 Filing 38 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/17/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #34 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal Schedule A regarding Complaint #10 , Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #11 , Exhibits 7 and 8 to the Declaration of Lisa M. Willis #16 , #17 , and the Temporary Restraining Order #26 . Status hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #34 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Chapter 4 Corp. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #34 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chapter 4 Corp. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Trainor)(Trainor, Martin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/3/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #28 is granted. The Court finds that good cause exists to extend the sealed temporary restraining order entered 9/19/2019 #26 for an additional 14 days. The sealed temporary restraining order shall expire on 10/17/2019. Status hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #28 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Chapter 4 Corp. in support of extension of time #28 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
September 26, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt No. 4624230751 posted by Chapter 4 Corp., by Attorney Greer Burns and Crain, Ltd. (ec, )
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant YA LEI ZHU and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (td, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Motion hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff having come to be heard on its ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the Defendant domain names, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #12 , the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for the requested relief, without written or oral notice to the adverse parties, as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b). Accordingly, the motions are granted. The temporary restraining order is entered effective 5:00 p.m. on 9/19/2019 and shall expire in fourteen (14) days. It is further ordered that Plaintiff shall deposit with the Court ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00) as security, determined adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of a wrongful restraint hereunder. Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #6 and motion for electronic service of process #18 are granted. The Clerk is directed to maintain the following documents under seal until further order of this Court: (1) Schedule A regarding Complaint (Dkt. No. #10 ), (2) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #11 ), and (3) Exhibits 7 and 8 to the Declaration of Lisa M. Willis (Dkt. Nos. #16 #17 ). Only Plaintiff's counsel and Court staff shall have access to these documents. Status hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chapter 4 Corp. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Chapter 4 Corp. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 , motion for leave to file #6 , motion for temporary restraining order #12 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Chapter 4 Corp. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Exhibit 8 regarding declaration #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Exhibit 7 - Parts 1-6 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lisa M. Willis regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Chapter 4 Corp. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (gcy, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chapter 4 Corp.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16232104. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapter 4 Corp. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapter 4 Corp.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?