Vanco v. Mancini et al
Plaintiff: David K. Vanco
Defendant: Madison LLC, Chicago Flameproof and Wood Specialties Corp., Vincent Mancini, Northern Illinois Lumber Specialties Corp and Maddy Rossobillo
Case Number: 1:2019cv06132
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David K. Vanco by Michael Alan Goldberg (Goldberg, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David K. Vanco. Vincent Mancini waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Tomei, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David K. Vanco. Maddy Rossobillo waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Tomei, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David K. Vanco. Chicago Flameproof and Wood Specialties Corp. waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Tomei, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David K. Vanco. Madison LLC waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Tomei, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David K. Vanco. Northern Illinois Lumber Specialties Corp waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Tomei, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by David K. Vanco against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Tomei, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The allegations of diversity of citizenship under 28 U.S.C. 1332 are insufficient to establish jurisdiction. The court will dismiss unless the plaintiff properly pleads his own citizenship and that of the individual defendants, rather than their residency. See Held v. Held, 137 F.3d 998, 1000 (7th Cir.1998) ("It is well settled that when the parties allege residence but not citizenship, the court must dismiss the suit.") (quoting Guaranty Nat'l Title Co. v. J.E.G. Assocs., 101 F.3d 57, 59 (7th Cir.1996)). The plaintiff must also show that the citizenship of all the members of the LLC defendant is diverse from the citizenship of the plaintiff. See Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729, 731 (7th Cir. 1998) ("[C]itizenship of an LLC for purposes of the diversity jurisdiction is the citizenship of its members."). Plaintiff is given until 10/10/19 to file an amended complaint. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Flameproof and Wood Specialties Corp., Madison LLC, Northern Illinois Lumber Specialties Corp (daj, )
September 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by David K. Vanco; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16233193. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tomei, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tomei, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David K. Vanco by Robert J Tomei, Jr (Tomei, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanco v. Mancini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Flameproof and Wood Specialties Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Illinois Lumber Specialties Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maddy Rossobillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Vanco
Represented By: Robert J Tomei, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Alan Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?