The F. Dohmen Co. v. LSCS Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: The F. Dohmen Co.
Defendant: LSCS Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06139
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing held. The Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule: First Written Discovery Deadline: January 16, 2020; Fact Discovery Completion Deadline: April 23, 2020; Expert Disclosure and Opening Report Deadline: June 4, 2020; Expert Opposition Report Deadline: July 9, 2020; Expert Reply Report Deadline: August 6, 2020; Expert Discovery Completion Deadline: September 3, 2020. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint. Status hearing set for 3/3/20 at 9:00am. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by LSCS Holdings, Inc. (O'Neil, William)
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Counter Claimant LSCS Holdings, Inc., Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc.. (O'Neil, William)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Carolyn E Isaac on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Isaac, Carolyn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Dohmen's motion for leave to file redacted answer to the counterclaim #23 is granted. No appearance necessary on 10/31/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF'S REDACTED ANSWER to Complaint COUNTERCLAIM by The F. Dohmen Co.(Fieweger, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by James Peter Fieweger for presentment of motion for leave to file #23 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/31/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Fieweger, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. for leave to file Redacted Answer to the Counterclaim (Fieweger, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: LSCS Holdings, Inc's motion for leave to redact and file under seal #15 and motion for leave to redact counterclaim #19 are granted. No appearance necessary on 10/10/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. regarding MOTION by Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc.for Leave to Redact Counterclaim #19 (O'Neil, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by William Charles O'Neil for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (O'Neil, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc.for Leave to Redact Counterclaim (O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. regarding answer to complaint,, counterclaim, #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit I)(O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by LSCS Holdings, Inc. against The F. Dohmen Co. . by LSCS Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-I)(O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by William Charles O'Neil for presentment of motion for leave to file #15 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. for leave to file Redact and File Under Seal (O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LSCS Holdings, Inc. (O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. by William Charles O'Neil (O'Neil, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. by Whitney M. Ising (Ising, Whitney)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. by Gretchen Vetter Scavo (Scavo, Gretchen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, )
September 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LSCS Holdings, Inc. (td, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co.'s motion to seal document Exhibit C to Complaint #5 is granted. Plaintiff is permitted to file Exhibit A and B with redactions and Exhibit C under seal. Initial status hearing is set for 11/14/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. by Carolyn E Isaac (Isaac, Carolyn)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. by Daniel J. Vaccaro (Vaccaro, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. by Michael David Bess (Bess, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. to seal document Exhibit C to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Fieweger, James)
September 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. EXHIBIT C regarding complaint #1 (Fieweger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fieweger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The F. Dohmen Co. by James Peter Fieweger (Fieweger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The F. Dohmen Co.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16234364. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fieweger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The F. Dohmen Co. v. LSCS Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The F. Dohmen Co.
Represented By: Carolyn E Isaac
Represented By: Michael David Bess
Represented By: Daniel J. Vaccaro
Represented By: James Peter Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSCS Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen Vetter Scavo
Represented By: Whitney M. Ising
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?