Perfect Search Media Corp. v. Galvanize, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Perfect Search Media Corp.
Defendant: Hack Reactor LLC and Galvanize, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06162
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #33 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: In light of the Notice of Dismissal #33 , the preliminary settlement discussion set for 2/6/2020 and the in-person settlement conference set for 2/10/2020 are stricken. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned district judge. Mailed notice. (cc, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Perfect Search Media Corp. (Barron, Mark)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC to motion to compel #18 (Wolf, Richard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Perfect Search Media Corp.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC to compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Fraud and Violation of the IDTPA #18 (Barron, Mark)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing held. An in-person settlement conference is set for 2/10/2020 at 1:30pm. A preliminary settlement discussion with lead counsel is set for 2/6/2020 at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephonic settlement call with Defendants' counsel and jointly contact chambers at (312) 435-3000. Plaintiff's settlement letter is due by 1/21/2020. Defendants' settlement letter is due by 1/31/2020. Counsel cannot agree to amend the letter exchange deadlines amongst themselves. Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Harjani requires compliance with his Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which is available on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE (Corrected) entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Counsel's request to reset status hearing previously set for 12/3/2019 to 12/4/2019 at 9:15 a.m. is granted. Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Counsel's request to reset status hearing previously set for 12/3/2019 to 12/5/2019 at 9:15 a.m. is granted. Appearance is not required on 12/3/2019. Mailed notice (lxs, ) Modified on 11/25/2019 (lxs, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: This case has been referred to Judge Harjani to conduct a settlement conference. Initial status hearing is set for 12/3/2019 at 9:25 a.m. in Courtroom 1858 to set a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 26 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Settlement conference.(ca, )Mailed notice.
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/21/19. Defendants' unopposed motion to strike Plaintiff's jury demand [16 ] is granted. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration #18 is due by 12/12/19; reply due by 12/20/19. The parties request a settlement conference. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Harjani for a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 2/13/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status and motion hearing set for 11/20/19 is reset to 11/21/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Perfect Search Media Corp. (Boelen, Maria)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Perfect Search Media Corp. by Mark Simeon Barron (Barron, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 21 Certification Regarding Obligations Under MIDP by Perfect Search Media Corp. (Barron, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC and F.R.C.P. 7.1 (Wolf, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Zachary Wolf for presentment of motion to compel #18 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wolf, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC to compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Fraud and Violation of the IDTPA (Wolf, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Zachary Wolf for presentment of motion to strike #16 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wolf, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC to strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand (Wolf, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court is in receipt of the Plaintiff's status report #14 . The Court expects the parties to file a joint status report in compliance with this Court's standing orders. To facilitate the preparation of that report, the initial status set for 11/12/19 is reset to 11/20/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report by Perfect Search Media Corp. (Boelen, Maria)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Unopposed motion for extension of time until November 7, 2019 to answer #10 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Perfect Search Media Corp. regarding Alias Summons served on Hack Reactor, LLC on 10-3-19 (Boelen, Maria)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Zachary Wolf for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wolf, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC for extension of time to file answer (Wolf, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC by Richard Zachary Wolf (Wolf, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Perfect Search Media Corp. (Boelen, Maria)
October 2, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Hack Reactor LLC. (yt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Perfect Search Media Corp. regarding Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent Gogency Global Inc. for Galvanize, Inc. on September 20, 2019 (Boelen, Maria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 11/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Galvanize, Inc., Hack Reactor LLC (ecw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Perfect Search Media Corp. by Maria Ann Boelen (Boelen, Maria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
September 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Perfect Search Media Corp. re complaint #1 , civil cover sheet #2 (Boelen, Maria)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Boelen, Maria)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Perfect Search Media Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16236753. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Boelen, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect Search Media Corp. v. Galvanize, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hack Reactor LLC
Represented By: Richard Zachary Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galvanize, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Zachary Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect Search Media Corp.
Represented By: Maria Ann Boelen
Represented By: Mark Simeon Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?