Watkins v. Social Security Adm
Plaintiff: Victor Watkins
Defendant: Social Security Adm
Case Number: 1:2019cv06167
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Defendant's motion to reset the 11/21/2019 status hearing #16 is denied. (mk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas G. Snodgrass for presentment of motion to reset #16 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Snodgrass, Douglas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Social Security Adm to reset Initial Status Hearing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine Gibbons)(Snodgrass, Douglas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Victor Watkins. (nsf, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a)&(c) on 11/21/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2103. Plaintiff (or counsel, if plaintiff is represented by counsel) and attorney for defendant are directed to appear in person. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/1/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint and 2 copies by Victor Watkins. (nsf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for a more definite statement #8 is withdrawn. (mk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas G. Snodgrass for presentment of motion to withdraw #10 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Snodgrass, Douglas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Social Security Adm to withdraw motion for more definite statement #8 (Snodgrass, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas G. Snodgrass for presentment of motion for more definite statement #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Snodgrass, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Social Security Admfor more definite statement (Snodgrass, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Social Security Adm (Snodgrass, Douglas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Victor Watkins for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Victor Watkins. (nsf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by Victor Watkins. (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Social Security Adm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Adm
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?