Viacom International Inc. v. STICKERSUPERSHOP
Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc.
Defendant: STICKERSUPERSHOP
Case Number: 1:2019cv06179
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/11/2019:(rao, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Motion hearing held on 10/11/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #15 is granted. (rao, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viacom International Inc. as to STICKERSUPERSHOP on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of service)(Vogt, Keith)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Viacom International Inc. (Document not scanned). (kp, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction #15 , memorandum in support of motion #16 , exhibit #18 , notice of motion #17 (Vogt, Keith)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Keith A. Vogt regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Vogt, Keith)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #15 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Viacom International Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #15 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
September 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant STICKERSUPERSHOP (mc, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 6 is granted. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Temporary restraining order to remain in effect for 14 days. Plaintiff's are ordered to deposit $10,000 cash or surety bond with the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for emergency hearing on motion for temporary restraining order #9 is withdrawn. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #10 , motion for miscellaneous relief #9 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #10 , motion for miscellaneous relief #9 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc.Emergency Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Vogt, Keith)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Vogt, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to the Declaration of Keith Vogt, #3 Declaration Declaration of Laurie Lawrence-Dillon, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Laurie Lawrence-Dillon)(Vogt, Keith)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
September 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Viacom International Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16240272. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 copyrights)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viacom International Inc. v. STICKERSUPERSHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc.
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STICKERSUPERSHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?